CHARITY OF LORD ARUNDELL OF WARDOUR

Charity number: 201658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.76k £4.76k £5.15k £8.19k £5.78k
Total expenditure £4.82k £3.20k £5.70k £3.48k £4.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A