THE HOLDENHURST CHARITY

Charity number: 201680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.51k £5.61k £5.67k £5.88k £6.01k
Total expenditure £3.50k £4.48k £2.65k £3.08k £4.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A