Financial history CHARITY OF SAMUEL LEE

Charity number: 201786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.92k £5.92k £2.50k £946 £1.30k
Total expenditure £2.79k £5.77k £2.09k £1.98k £805
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A