PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 202192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.69k £11.68k £12.12k £11.91k £9.15k
Total expenditure £12.42k £8.98k £8.80k £10.47k £13.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A