Governing document MR WILLATS' CHARITY
Charity number: 202269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 13/11/1858 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/09/1925 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/08/1949 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/06/1965 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/12/1986 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/12/2014
Charitable objects
GRANTS TO LAY WORKERS IN CHURCH OF ENGLAND PARISHES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.