Trustees THE BRISTOL CORN TRADE GUILD
Charity number: 202404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC STEPHEN THOMAS | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Daniel Hughes | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Chapman | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Davies | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jacobsen COX | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charles Thomas Stuart Delf | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Prior | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Graham Stanford | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ROBERTS | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAN EASTWOOD | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER SIMON ALLANSON-BAILEY | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR M A SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR G B COOMBES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Townend | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR B J P NUTTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.