Trustees THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP

Charity number: 202513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Still Trustee 01 June 2022
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
Lucy Allen Trustee 01 March 2022
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
Reginald Douglas Whitehouse Trustee 20 June 2019
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 137 days
Patricia Jayne Newman Trustee 20 June 2017
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 137 days
Lynda Juliet Norden Trustee 16 November 2011
FULBOURN ALMHOUSES CHARITY
Received: 167 days late
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 137 days
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
Rev ALICE ABIGAIL GOODMAN Trustee 10 June 2011
THE ST NICHOLAS GREAT WILBRAHAM TRUST
Received: 66 days late
FARMER'S CHARITY
Overdue by 229 days
WESTON'S CHARITY
Overdue by 229 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN
Received: On time
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 137 days
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
ANNE WARD (OR WAAD)
Received: On time
THE JAMES BENSTEAD CHARITY
Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
Robert Lacey Trustee 30 January 2011
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 137 days
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
Rachael Ruth Kindred Trustee 30 January 2011
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 137 days
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
Adrian Miles Pretto Chaplin Trustee 30 January 2011
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 137 days
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
Philip Christopher Hodgson Trustee
CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY
Received: On time
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 137 days