Trustees CHERITON FITZPAINE PARISH HALL
Charity number: 202545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARL BRYAN STEELE | Chair | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Brown | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Porter | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Leigh Handcock | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Dibley | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mr Roy Clayton | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA CATHERINE SMITH | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Pink | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CARMICHAEL DEAN | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JUNE TONKIN | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY ALBERT EDWARD BURCHMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA LILIAN FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.