Accounts and annual returns CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 202719
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required