Financial history CHARITY OF ALDERMAN STEEVENS

Charity number: 202843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £14.77k £14.63k £10.28k £25.63k £38.98k
Total expenditure £11.62k £28.63k £12.43k £24.96k £17.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A