Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF WILLIAM BATCHELOR

Charity number: 203063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required