Trustees KNOWLE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 203387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverley Alderson | Chair | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Natalie Sweet | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Franklin | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Manfield | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Richardson | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Healey | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Branfield | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE COX | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAT HAYMAN | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MANDY DICKINSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.