Financial history PETER SPECCOTT

Charity number: 203987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.63k £2.62k £3.33k £3.77k £3.08k
Total expenditure £1.02k £976 £1.21k £1.63k £1.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A