Trustees CULLOMPTON UNITED CHARITY
Charity number: 204031
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary HEARD | Chair | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
BEE GOFF | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl van der Salm | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Speirs | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Haslett | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Russell | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Nderitu | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA FORD | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HARRIS | Trustee | 20 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV EDWARD HOBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER LABDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERESA CUMMINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.