TILEHURST POOR'S LAND CHARITY

Charity number: 204048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required Download