WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND

Charity number: 204069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David McKinley Gant Chair 02 October 2012
WESTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
FARMER'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO Recently registered
Dr Andrew Garth Tristram Trustee 07 March 2020 None on record
Rev Alice Goodman Trustee 05 August 2012
THE JOHNSON, BEDE AND LANE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
David Francis Sheppard Trustee 19 December 2014
WESTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
FARMER'S CHARITY Received: On time
TOWNLEY MEMORIAL HALL Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO Recently registered
DR Anita Whitehead Trustee 01 April 2012
WESTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
FARMER'S CHARITY Received: On time
Hugo Andrew Jasper White Trustee 15 July 2020
TOWNLEY MEMORIAL HALL Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO Recently registered
Penny Jane Seddon Trustee 15 July 2020 None on record
Rachel Ruth Kindred Trustee 30 November 2019
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO Recently registered