LOUISA RUDDLE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 204411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 October 2018 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required