PETER HOLWAY

Charity number: 204581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.11k £1.11k £1.11k £1.11k £3.05k
Total expenditure £164 £165 £1.72k £1.07k £218
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A