Financial history MARY LOCKINGTON CHARITY

Charity number: 204766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.71k £12.16k £12.85k £12.64k £11.74k
Total expenditure £5.89k £6.31k £3.02k £3.43k £3.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A