Financial history CLIFTON WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 204853
Charity reporting is overdue by 488 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £324 £349 £356 £363 £370
Total expenditure £0 £250 £0 £0 £300
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A