ST MARY'S FERNDOWN CARE FUND

Charity number: 204948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.75k £1.84k £3.43k £2.65k £3.85k
Total expenditure £1.67k £1.02k £3.66k £2.23k £3.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A