Financial history SAMUEL SHEPHERD

Charity number: 204971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.21k £10.14k £10.00k £10.60k £11.38k
Total expenditure £12.04k £10.43k £11.71k £12.54k £9.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A