Trustees CHRIST'S HOSPITAL OF ABINGDON
Charity number: 205112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Birks | Chair | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Evans | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Oliver Forder | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Tom Greenaway | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Lewis OBE | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen William Workman | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriella Barody | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Saunders | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Julia Durell Kent | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|||||
LAURENCE Dennis KING | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Simon McConnell | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|||||
KEVIN SENIOR | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev CHARLES MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.