ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS OXFORDSHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 205156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time Download