Trustees COLLEGE OF ST BARNABAS
Charity number: 205220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Michael Williams | Chair | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Ruth Alicia Martin | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Ian Peter Whitley | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Ursula Mary Hodges | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Adrian Robert Barnett Johnson | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev David Ivorson | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Wendy Jane Edwards | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Eileen Margaret Phillips | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Cynthia Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Edwin Peter Diggory | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Lawrence Beynon | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
The Venerable Moira Anne Elizabeth Astin | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Martyn Douglas Williams | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ANTHONY PROCTOR | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.