Trustees BISHOPS LYDEARD CHARITY
Charity number: 205264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M C HANSFORD | Chair | |||||||
Carole Balston | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Louise Foster | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cahalin | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Hurley | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Martin | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peacocke | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Smeaton | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ABIGALE CLARE COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CAMPBELL LACY DAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD GEORGE FERRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.