THE PARISH STOCK

Charity number: 205290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 March 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required