OAKE AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 205829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £36.32k £35.22k £32.07k £30.57k £36.05k
Total expenditure £33.29k £34.70k £28.09k £36.24k £44.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.05k £1.55k £1.55k £1.12k £1.12k