Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SOUTH WILTSHIRE AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 205962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £37.84k £29.32k £29.41k £27.94k £63.39k
Total expenditure £32.69k £48.32k £25.75k £65.66k £32.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A