Accounts and annual returns THE ELIZA STENNETT CHARITY

Charity number: 206080
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required