BEECHWOOD HALL AND RURAL PARK

Charity number: 206200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £24.65k £23.10k £46.21k £22.02k £18.50k
Total expenditure £28.62k £24.34k £40.46k £21.74k £22.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £495 £0 N/A N/A N/A