Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MID SUSSEX AND EASTBOURNE BRANCH

Charity number: 206308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £98.05k £40.98k £32.90k £45.15k £27.19k
Total expenditure £23.51k £36.52k £42.02k £79.85k £31.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A