NORWICH CHURCH OF ENGLAND YOUNG MEN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 206425
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £192.24k £210.69k £211.94k £208.01k £186.63k
Total expenditure £222.98k £252.90k £235.18k £240.56k £246.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A