Financial history JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 206538
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £22 £24 £26 £29 £29
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £29 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A