Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM MEDLAND'S CHARITY

Charity number: 206541
Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 199 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 199 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 10 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required