Financial history EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 206544
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £11 £12 £14 £15 £15
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £15 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A