Trustees WORLD HORSE WELFARE
Charity number: 206658

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BAINES | Chair | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Meredith Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
SAIMA HABIB | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Allen | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hugh Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Davies CVO DL | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Melissa Gray-Cheape | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Wynne Tufnell MRCVS | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAM BULLARD | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
John Jarvis KC | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Keith Price CBE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ross | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Nokes MP | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Davison | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tom Morrison | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.