Governing document WILSHAW BENEVOLENT TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/01/1941 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22/11/1943 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24/06/1946 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/12/1957 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/01/1963 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31/12/1973 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/07/1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/03/1988 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14/11/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/12/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/03/2012
Charitable objects
PECUNIARY GRANTS OF PAYMENTS TO BENEFICIARIES IN CASES OF NECESSITY OR DISTRESS ALSO AID IN SICKNESS. IN SO FAR AND ONLY IN SO FAR AS THERE REMAINS INCOME UNEXPENDED AFTER MEETING THE NEEDS OF THE BENEFICIARIES AND WHICH IS NOT REQUIRED TO MEET ANTICIPATED FUTURE NEEDS IT MAY BE GIVEN TO THE CABLE AND WIRELESS PORTHCURNO AND COLLECTIONS TRUST (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 1062233) FOR ITS PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.