Trustees THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST
Charity number: 207014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jane Judith Bakker | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
The Right Reverend James Emerson Grier | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
The Venerable Verena Breed | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Edward Quincey Hobbs | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
The Venerable Andrew Mark Beane | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
ANNIE PENELOPE JEFFERIES | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
The Rt Rev Jackie Searle | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
THE VERY REVD JONATHAN GREENER | Trustee | 26 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Mr G Frampton | Trustee | 28 November 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Rev MICHAEL JOHN PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
The Venerable DOUGLAS JAMES DETTMER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.