Trustees Lord Petre & Puckle Charities
Charity number: 207227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Clark | Chair | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL MARK LAWRENCE | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV MICHAEL ALAN HALL | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WALLIS | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MICHAEL GINN | Trustee | 31 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE DRAGE | Trustee | 26 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN STRONG | Trustee | 17 May 1991 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.