MARTHA PENELOPE LEGGATT FOR A PARISH HALL

Charity number: 207267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.54k £23.64k £29.86k £30.40k £28.95k
Total expenditure £37.00k £50.14k £34.77k £18.97k £28.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A