Trustees THE SCOTTISH HOSPITAL OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING CHARLES THE SECOND (ROYAL SCOTTISH CORPORATION)
Charity number: 207326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheryl Louise Jermyn | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Cadzow-Collins | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Brown | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ogilvie Close | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Callum Ross | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Oram | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Gilmore | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David McMurtrie | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Somerville | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lynch | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Danny Tsang | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Guild | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE HARVIE | Trustee | 10 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.