Financial history CARSHALTON CORONATION COMMEMORATION FUND

Charity number: 207351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.05k £10.23k £7.35k £7.39k £7.50k
Total expenditure £3.29k £4.05k £2.85k £929 £790
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A