Financial history THE NORTHCOTE TRUST

Charity number: 207813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £156.64k £166.04k £161.06k £175.02k £140.00k
Total expenditure £142.49k £155.38k £161.91k £111.43k £171.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A