Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF LIFE FROM FIRE

Charity number: 207820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Piers Latham Chair 15 May 2013
None on record
Rosemary Frances Beaver Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
TIMOTHY JOSEPH CARROLL Trustee 29 November 2022
FRIENDS OF UCD
Received: On time
David Andrew Torrance Trustee 28 November 2017
The Arts Society Blackmore Vale
Received: 34 days late
Peter Geoffrey Ward Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
Richard Owen Hudson Trustee 15 May 2014
None on record
GRAHAM DOSWELL Trustee
None on record