Accounts and annual returns MATTHEW WYLDBORE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 208135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 29 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 04 February 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 27 May 2020 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 January 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required