Governing document THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES CONFIRMED AT A SPECIAL GENERAL MEETING HELD ON 26TH OCTOBER 1964, AS AMENDED ON 24TH APRIL 1967, 19TH MAY 1969, 24TH MAY 1971, 7TH JUNE 1972, 3RD JUNE 1987, 20TH JULY 1990, 11TH MARCH 1997 AND 6 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO AFFORD ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE (A) CORPORATE AND NON-CORPORATE MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS, OR (B) FORMER CORPORATE AND NON-CORPORATE MEMBERS WHO HAVE PAID THEIR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO THE INSTITUTION FOR AT LEAST FIVE YEARS, OR (C) DEPENDANTS OF ANY OF THE ABOVE MENTIONED (A) OR (B) WHETHER THE MEMBER IS ALIVE OR DECEASED, OR (D) THE DEPENDANTS OF ANY FORMER MEMBER OF THE INSTITUTION OF MUNICIPAL ENGINEERS (WHETHER SUCH FORMER MEMBER IS ALIVE OR DECEASED) WHO WOULD NOT BE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE UNDER PARAGRAPHS (A)-(C) INCLUSIVE OF THIS RULE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.