Financial history THE LORD AUSTIN TRUST

Charity number: 208394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £109.35k £124.70k £129.98k £132.22k £100.13k
Total expenditure £114.82k £119.07k £133.57k £116.39k £113.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A