Financial history AMBROSE AND ANN APPELBE TRUST

Charity number: 208658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £57.13k £61.78k £65.74k £51.40k £58.74k
Total expenditure £28.63k £37.09k £60.46k £51.64k £46.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A