Financial history CHARTERHOUSE-IN-SOUTHWARK

Charity number: 208785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £167.89k £159.12k £188.11k £195.06k £183.35k
Total expenditure £191.65k £206.03k £171.84k £157.62k £218.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A